Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 09/28/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/05/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/01/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/10/2000