Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/28/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/28/1999
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/28/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/04/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 02/04/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/08/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/09/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/10/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/24/1999