Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/07/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/26/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/26/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/01/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 11/18/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 01/27/2000