Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/28/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/03/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/03/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/11/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/11/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/11/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/24/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/24/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/02/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/21/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/25/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/09/1999
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 01/31/2000