Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/02/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 11/16/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/05/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/25/2000