There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Small Watershed Rehabilitation Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Small Watershed Rehabilitation Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Watershed Protection and Flood Prevention Act to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to provide cost share assistance for the rehabilitation of structural measures constructed as part of water resources projects previously funded by the Secretary under such Act or related laws.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
10/24/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10944)
09/12/2000Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Lugar without amendment. With written report No. 408.
10/21/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/25/2000-6:39pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/25/2000-10:10amHouseReceived in the House.
10/25/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10944)
10/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.4339 Amendment SA 4339 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/24/2000SenateS.Amdt.4339 Amendment SA 4339 proposed by Senator Smith NH for Senator Harkin. (consideration: CR S10943; text: CR S10943) To make certain technical amendments.
10/24/2000SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10943-10944)
09/12/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 798.
09/12/2000SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Reported by Senator Lugar without amendment. With written report No. 408.
06/20/2000SenateCommittee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
10/21/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture. (text of measure as introduced: CR S13016-13019)
10/21/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13016)

Cosponsors (20)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry10/21/1999 Referred to
06/20/2000 Markup by
09/12/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-408

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1762. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/24/2000)

Small Watershed Rehabilitation Act of 2000 - Amends the Watershed Protection and Flood Prevention Act to authorize the Secretary of Agriculture to provide financial assistance to an eligible local organization to cover a portion of the total costs incurred for the rehabilitation of structural measures originally constructed as part of a covered water resource project. Limits the amount of Federal funds that may be made available for construction of a particular rehabilitation project to 65 percent of the total rehabilitation costs, but not to exceed 100 percent of actual construction costs incurred, and makes the local organization responsible for resource rights costs and all Federal, State, and local permits.

Authorizes the Secretary, acting through the Natural Resources Conservation Service, to provide technical assistance to planning, designing, and implementing rehabilitation projects should such an organization request such assistance.

Prohibits any assistance authorized from being used to perform operation and maintenance activities.

Outlines assistance application requirements. Directs the Secretary to: (1) establish a system of approving rehabilitation assistance requests from eligible organizations equitably; and (2) give requests made for decommissioning the same priority as requests made for other forms of rehabilitation.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 2001 through 2005 to provide financial and technical assistance. Earmarks funds authorized for the first two fiscal years for an assessment by the Secretary of the rehabilitation needs of covered projects. Requires: (1) the Secretary to maintain a database to track the benefits derived from rehabilitation projects and expenditures and report annually to Congress on the status of activities conducted; and (2) eligible local organizations that received assistance to report to the Secretary on the status of rehabilitation efforts after the completion of the specific projects for which assistance was provided.