Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 10/21/1999
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/16/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 11/17/1999
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/08/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 02/08/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/28/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/09/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/22/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/30/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/30/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/30/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/30/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/06/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/07/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/25/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 04/25/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/04/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/23/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/07/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/26/2000