There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Continued Reporting of Intercepted Wire, Oral, and Electronic Communications Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Continued Reporting of Intercepted Wire, Oral, and Electronic Communications Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Continued Reporting of Intercepted Wire, Oral, and Electronic Communications Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Continued Reporting of Intercepted Wire, Oral, and Electronic Communications Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to continue reporting requirements of section 2519 of title 18, United States Code, beyond December 21, 1999, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
05/02/2000Became Public Law No: 106-197. (TXT | PDF)
05/02/2000Signed by President.
04/20/2000Presented to President.
04/13/2000Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2813-2814; text as Senate agreed to House amendments: CR S2813)
11/18/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
11/18/1999Committee on Judiciary discharged.
11/05/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S14222-14223; text of measure as passed: CR S14223; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S14222)
10/28/1999Committee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with amendments. Without written report.
10/22/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
05/02/2000Became Public Law No: 106-197. (TXT | PDF)
05/02/2000Signed by President.
04/20/2000SenatePresented to President.
04/14/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/13/2000SenateSenate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2813-2814; text as Senate agreed to House amendments: CR S2813)
11/19/1999SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
11/18/1999-8:04pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/18/1999-8:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/18/1999-8:03pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
11/18/1999-8:03pmHouseH.Amdt.562 On agreeing to the Coble amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H12883-12884)
11/18/1999-8:03pmHouseH.Amdt.562 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Coble. (consideration: CR H12883-12884)
11/18/1999-8:03pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H12882-12884)
11/18/1999-8:02pmHouseMr. Coble asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
11/18/1999HouseCommittee on Judiciary discharged.
11/12/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/08/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
11/08/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/08/1999-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/05/1999SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S14222-14223; text of measure as passed: CR S14223; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S14222)
10/28/1999SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
10/28/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 355.
10/28/1999SenateCommittee on Judiciary. Reported to Senate by Senator Hatch with amendments. Without written report.
10/22/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S13052-13053)
10/22/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S13052)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 10/22/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary10/22/1999 Referred to
10/28/1999 Markup by
10/28/1999 Reported by
House Judiciary11/08/1999 Referred to
11/18/1999 Discharged from
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime11/12/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1769.


Subjects (16)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1769. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/18/1999)

Makes a provision of the Federal Reports Elimination and Sunset Act of 1995 which terminates on December 31, 1999, all reporting requirements contained on a list prepared by the Clerk of the House of Representatives for the first session of the 103rd Congress inapplicable to certain reporting requirements under specified Federal provisions and Acts, including: (1) the reports that the Director of the Administrative Office of the United States Courts is required to transmit to Congress each April concerning the number of applications for orders authorizing or approving wire, oral, or electronic communications interception; (2) the requirements for the Department of Justice's annual report on crime statistics; and (3) the Immigration and Naturalization Service's annual statistical report.

(Sec. 2) Amends the Federal criminal code to require the Attorney General or specified other officials to report to the Administrative Office each January on the number of such orders in which encryption was encountered and whether such encryption prevented law enforcement from obtaining the plain text of communications intercepted.

(Sec. 3) Directs the Attorney General to include within an annual report to Congress on pen registers and trap and trace devices information concerning: (1) the period of interceptions authorized by each order and the number and duration of any extensions of the order; (2) the offense specified in the order, application, or extension of an order; (3) the number of investigations involved; (4) the number and nature of the facilities affected; and (5) the identity, including district, of the applying investigative or law enforcement agency making the application and the person authorizing the order.