Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/28/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/19/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/19/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/19/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 11/19/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/19/1999
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/31/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/31/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/29/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/01/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/02/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/06/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/20/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/20/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/20/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/27/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/29/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/29/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/04/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/04/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/05/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/07/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/12/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/01/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/15/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/23/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/16/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/10/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/10/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/14/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/19/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/11/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/12/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/14/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/20/2000