Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 10/27/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 10/27/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 11/17/1999
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/12/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/06/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 12/06/2000