Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/06/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/06/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/09/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/22/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/11/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/12/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/22/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew