Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 11/10/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/09/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/23/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/09/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/29/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/30/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/13/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/25/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/11/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/16/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/06/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/06/2000