Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 11/09/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 11/09/1999
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/10/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/10/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/07/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/29/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/05/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/20/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/21/2000