Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/10/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/19/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/26/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/04/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/25/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 06/15/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/06/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/19/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 12/07/2000