Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/01/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 02/01/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/01/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/01/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/01/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 02/02/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/02/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/03/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/03/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/09/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/09/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/10/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/10/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/22/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/23/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/24/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/29/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/29/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/01/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/06/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/07/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/07/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/08/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/20/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/29/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/05/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/05/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/06/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/12/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/12/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/13/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/26/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/03/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/03/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 05/03/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/03/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/04/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/04/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/04/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/08/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/08/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/08/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/08/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/10/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/10/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/11/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 05/11/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/16/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/18/2000