Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/01/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/01/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/01/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/01/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/01/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/01/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/03/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/07/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/07/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/08/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/10/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/23/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/09/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/22/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/22/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/23/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/06/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/11/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/13/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/26/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/27/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/02/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/04/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/06/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/20/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/22/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/30/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/11/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/19/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/05/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 10/03/2000