Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 11/17/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/07/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/08/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 02/08/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/28/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/28/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/11/2000