Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/24/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/24/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 01/27/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/01/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/01/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/02/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/03/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/08/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/09/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/10/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 02/10/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/22/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/23/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/24/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/28/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/29/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/29/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/01/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/02/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/07/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/09/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/21/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/22/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/22/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/27/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 04/04/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/01/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/11/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/24/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/06/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/06/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/13/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/27/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/05/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/12/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 10/03/2000