Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/01/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/01/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/09/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/10/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/10/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 02/22/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 02/22/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/23/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/01/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/05/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/10/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/11/2000