Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/09/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/09/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/09/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/15/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/17/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 05/18/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/07/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 06/21/2000