Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/10/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/02/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/02/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/02/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/02/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/02/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/06/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/06/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/08/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/08/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/22/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/22/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/26/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/02/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/06/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/29/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/10/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/10/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 07/17/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/17/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/07/2000