Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/22/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/01/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/07/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/07/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/07/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/07/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/07/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/08/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/08/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/08/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/20/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/20/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/20/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/22/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/22/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/22/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/23/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/23/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/27/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/27/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/27/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/28/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/28/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/06/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/07/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/07/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/25/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/27/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/27/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 05/15/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/23/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/07/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/07/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/08/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew