Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/22/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/23/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/23/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 02/23/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/23/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/23/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/23/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/29/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/29/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/29/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/29/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/29/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/01/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/02/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/02/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/02/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/02/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/02/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/02/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/02/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/02/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/02/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/06/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/06/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/06/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/06/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/06/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/06/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/06/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/07/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/07/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/07/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/08/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/08/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/09/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/21/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 03/21/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 03/21/2000