Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/05/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/05/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/25/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/06/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/24/2000