Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 02/22/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/23/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/02/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 03/20/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/11/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/12/2000