Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/24/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/01/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/02/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/06/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/07/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/09/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/30/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/30/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/30/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/30/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/30/2000