Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/29/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/29/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/29/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/29/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/01/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/01/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/06/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/06/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/06/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/23/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/23/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/30/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/30/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/30/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/13/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 04/27/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 05/18/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/18/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/25/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/21/2000