Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 03/06/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/27/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 04/10/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/23/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/08/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/13/2000