Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/08/2000
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/08/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/20/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/20/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/25/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/03/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/09/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 05/15/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/07/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/12/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/12/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 07/12/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/12/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/12/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/12/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/12/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/12/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 07/12/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/12/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/12/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/12/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/12/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/12/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 07/12/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/12/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/12/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/12/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/12/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/12/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/12/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/12/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/12/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 07/12/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/12/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/12/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/12/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/12/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/12/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/12/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/12/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/12/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/12/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/12/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/13/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/13/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/13/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/13/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/13/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/13/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/13/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/13/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/13/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/13/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/13/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/13/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/13/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/13/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/13/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/13/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/13/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/13/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/13/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/13/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/13/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/13/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/14/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/14/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/17/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/24/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/30/2000