Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/21/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/21/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/21/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/21/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 03/21/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/21/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/22/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/06/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/06/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/03/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/25/2000