Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/22/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 03/22/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/22/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/22/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/22/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 04/25/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/25/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/25/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/25/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/25/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 04/25/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/25/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/25/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/25/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/02/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/02/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/02/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/08/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/08/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/10/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/16/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/22/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/22/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/22/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/24/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/25/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/25/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/25/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/06/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 06/06/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/06/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/06/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/07/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/12/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/13/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/14/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/14/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 06/15/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/19/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/20/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/22/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/23/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 06/23/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/23/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/27/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 06/27/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/27/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 06/27/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/28/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/29/2000
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 07/11/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/11/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/12/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/12/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 07/14/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/17/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/18/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/18/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/20/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/24/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/24/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/24/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/24/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/26/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/26/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/26/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/26/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/26/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/05/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/05/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/07/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/12/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/12/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/14/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/27/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/05/2000