Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/27/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/27/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/27/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/12/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/12/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/12/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/12/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/03/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 05/03/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/03/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/03/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/18/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/22/2000