There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior, pursuant to the provisions of the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Lakehaven water reclamation project for the reclamation and reuse of water

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Lakehaven water reclamation project for the reclamation and reuse of water.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/13/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10528-10529; text as passed Senate: CR S10529)
09/29/2000Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/28/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 106-439.
03/28/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/20/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
10/17/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/16/2000-3:18pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/16/2000-1:54pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/16/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/13/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10528-10529; text as passed Senate: CR S10529)
09/29/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 884.
09/29/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 09/28/2000 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 106-439.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
09/20/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
09/13/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Committee consideration held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
06/21/2000SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-764.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
03/28/2000SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
03/28/2000SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1815-1816)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 03/28/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/28/2000 Referred to
09/20/2000 Markup by
09/29/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-439
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/21/2000 Hearings by
House Resources10/17/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power10/20/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2301.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.2301. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/13/2000)

Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to participate in the design, planning, and construction of, and land acquisition for the Lakehaven water reclamation project, Washington, to reclaim and reuse wastewater, including degraded groundwater, within and outside the service area of the Lakehaven Utility District.

Limits the Federal share to 25 percent of total project costs. Prohibits funds provided by the Secretary from being used for project operation and maintenance. Permits funds appropriated pursuant to the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to be used for the Project. Requires the design, planning, and construction of the Project be in accordance with, and subject to the limitations contained in, such Act.