Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
10/20/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-345.
10/20/2000 Signed by President.
10/11/2000 Presented to President.
10/05/2000 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10029-10035)
10/05/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 411 - 0 (Roll no. 512).
06/06/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4595-4599)
05/15/2000 Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported to Senate by Senator Jeffords with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-294.
03/29/2000 Introduced in Senate