Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 04/11/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/12/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 04/26/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/26/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/04/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/04/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 05/04/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/04/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/08/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/08/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 05/08/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/08/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/09/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/10/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/10/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 05/10/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/10/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/11/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/25/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/25/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/08/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/14/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/27/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/11/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/27/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/05/2000