Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/22/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 01/22/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/25/1999
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/25/1999
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/28/1999