Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 04/12/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/02/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/02/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 05/02/2000
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/11/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/16/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/06/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/06/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/28/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/13/2000