There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Lewis and Clark Rural Water System Act of 1999

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Lewis and Clark Rural Water System Act of 1999

Short Titles as Introduced

Lewis and Clark Rural Water System Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the construction of the Lewis and Clark Rural Water System and to authorize assistance to the Lewis and Clark Rural Water System, Inc., a nonprofit corporation, for the planning and construction of the water supply system, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/19/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S15156-15157)
07/30/1999Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-130.
01/19/1999Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
02/02/2000HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/27/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
11/22/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/22/1999-1:33pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/22/1999-12:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/19/1999SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S15156-15157)
07/30/1999SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 242.
07/30/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-130.
07/28/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/27/1999SenateSubcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 106-208.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
04/21/1999SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, OMB.
01/20/1999SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
01/19/1999SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/19/1999SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S696)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/19/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/19/1999 Referred to
07/28/1999 Markup by
07/30/1999 Reported by S. Rept. 106-130
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power01/20/1999 Referred to
05/27/1999 Hearings by
House Resources01/27/2000 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power02/02/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.244. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/19/1999)

Lewis and Clark Rural Water System Act of 1999 - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to make grants to the Lewis and Clark Rural Water System, Inc., for the planning and construction of a water supply project to provide service for the member entities of specified counties in South Dakota, Minnesota, and Iowa.

Prohibits the Secretary from obligating project funds until: (1) National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 requirements are met; and (2) a final engineering report and a plan for a water conservation program are submitted to Congress.

Requires the Secretary to make grants and other funds available to the System and other private, State, and Federal entities for the initial development of the environmental enhancement component.

Specifies that mitigation for fish and wildlife losses incurred as a result of the construction and operation of the water supply project shall be on an acre-for-acre basis, based on ecological equivalency, concurrent with project construction.

Requires the Western Area Power Administration to make available the capacity and energy required to meet the pumping and incidental operational requirements of the water supply project during the period beginning May 1, and ending October 31, of each year from power designated for future irrigation and drainage pumping for the Pick-Sloan Missouri River Basin program, on specified conditions, including that: (1) the water supply system is operated on a not-for-profit basis; (2) the water supply system contracts to purchase the entire electric service requirements of the project from a qualified preference power supplier that itself purchases power from the Administration; and (3) the rate schedule applicable to the capacity and energy made available is the firm power rate schedule of the Pick-Sloan Eastern Division of the Administration.

Specifies an 80 percent Federal share of planning, construction, and development costs of the project. Requires the Secretary to provide funds for the city of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, equal to 50 percent of the incremental cost of its participation in the project.

Authorizes the Secretary to allow the Bureau of Reclamation to provide project construction oversight to the water supply project and environmental enhancement component.

Makes the System responsible for the annual operation and maintenance of such project.

Authorizes appropriations.