Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 04/25/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 04/25/2000
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 04/25/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 04/25/2000
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/26/2000
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/26/2000
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 04/26/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/26/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/27/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/27/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 05/01/2000
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/02/2000
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/08/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 05/09/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/11/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/15/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/16/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/23/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/23/2000
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 05/23/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/25/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/06/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 06/08/2000
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/19/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/26/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/27/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 06/27/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 06/27/2000
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/27/2000
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/28/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/28/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/28/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/28/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 06/28/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/28/2000