Text: S.2460 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-277 (10/02/2000)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 277]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ277.106]

Public Law 106-277
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
     To authorize the payment of rewards to individuals furnishing 
   information relating to persons subject to indictment for serious 
 violations of international humanitarian law in Rwanda, and for other 
             purposes. <<NOTE: Oct. 2, 2000 -  [S. 2460]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. EXPANSION OF REWARDS PROGRAM TO INCLUDE RWANDA.

    Section 102 of the Act of October 30, 1998 (Public Law 105-
323) <<NOTE: 22 USC 2708 note.>> is amended--
            (1) in the section heading, by inserting ``or rwanda'' after 
        ``yugoslavia'';
            (2) in subsection (a)(2), by inserting ``or the 
        International Criminal Tribunal for Rwanda'' after 
        ``Yugoslavia''; and
            (3) in subsection (c)--
                    (A) by inserting ``(1)'' immediately after 
                ``Reference.--''; and
                    (B) by adding at the end the following:

    ``(2) For the purposes of subsection (a), the statute of the 
International Criminal Tribunal for Rwanda means the statute contained 
in the annex to Security Council Resolution 955 of November 8, 1994.''.

    Approved October 2, 2000.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--S. 2460:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 146 (2000):
            June 23, considered and passed Senate.
            Sept. 19, considered and passed House.

                                  <all>

Share This Section