Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/12/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 03/11/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/15/1999
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/15/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/15/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/08/1999