Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 05/08/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/23/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/23/2000
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/08/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/20/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/18/2000
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/20/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/26/2000