Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 05/10/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/24/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/19/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/21/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/30/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/11/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/05/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/13/2000