Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/17/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 05/17/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/17/2000
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/07/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/08/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/25/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/04/2000