Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 01/19/1999
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/26/1999
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 02/23/1999
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/23/1999
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/19/1999
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/23/1999
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/12/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/01/2000
Sen. Miller, Zell [D-GA] 09/28/2000