There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Native American Languages Act Amendments Act of 2000

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Native American Languages Act Amendments Act of 2000

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Languages Act Amendments Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Native American Languages Act to provide for the support of Native American Language Survival Schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/10/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10156-10158; text as passed Senate: CR S10156-10158)
10/03/2000Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-467.
06/07/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
10/17/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
10/11/2000-9:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/11/2000-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
10/11/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/10/2000SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10156-10158; text as passed Senate: CR S10156-10158)
10/03/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 915.
10/03/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 106-467.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
09/27/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
07/20/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 106-648.
Action By: Committee on Indian Affairs
06/07/2000SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4670-4672)
06/07/2000SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4670)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs06/07/2000 Referred to
07/20/2000 Hearings by
09/27/2000 Markup by
10/03/2000 Reported by S. Rept. 106-467
House Education and the Workforce10/17/2000 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2688.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2688. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/10/2000)

Native American Languages Act Amendments Act of 2000 - Amends the Native American Languages Act to authorize the Secretary of Education to provide funds to Native American Language Educational Organizations (Organizations), Native American Language Colleges, Indian tribal governments, organizations that demonstrate potential to become Organizations, or a consortia of such organizations, colleges, or tribal governments to establish Native American Language Nest programs (site-based education programs conducted through a Native American language) for students below the age of seven and their families.

Authorizes the Secretary to provide funds to such Organizations, colleges, or governments to operate, expand, and increase Native American Language Survival Schools throughout the United States and its territories for Native American children and Native American language-speaking children. Allows a School receiving such funds to: (1) include Nest programs and other educational programs for students who are not Native American language speakers but who seek to establish fluency through instruction in such a language or to re-establish fluency as descendants of such language speakers; (2) provide instruction in more than one language and through regional programs; (3) include a program of concurrent and summer college or university education course enrollment for secondary school students enrolled in Schools, as appropriate; (4) provide special support for such languages for which there are very few or no remaining speakers; (5) develop comprehensive curricula in Native American language instruction; (6) provide teacher and staff training and personnel development and community resource development training; and (7) rent, purchase, construct, or repair educational facilities to ensure the academic achievement of School students.

Requires the Secretary to provide funds to establish three specified demonstration programs that will provide assistance to Schools and Nests at: (1) Ka Haka 'Ula O Ke'elikolani College of the University of Hawaii at Hilo, in consortium with the 'Aha Punana Leo, Inc., and with other entities if deemed appropriate by such college; (2) Piegan Institute of Browning, Montana; and (3) the Alaska Native Language Center of the University of Alaska at Fairbanks, in consortium with other entities deemed appropriate by such center. Authorizes such demonstration programs to employ synchronic and asynchronic telecommunications and other appropriate means to maintain coordination and cooperation with one another and with participating Schools and Nests. Requires such programs to provide direction to the Secretary in developing site visit evaluation of Schools and Nests. Authorizes such programs to: (1) establish endowments for furthering their activities relative to the study and preservation of Native American languages; and (2) use funds to provide for the rental, lease, purchase, construction, maintenance, and repair of facilities.

Authorizes appropriations.