Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/08/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/28/2000
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/28/2000
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/28/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/28/2000
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/28/2000
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/2000
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/28/2000
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/28/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/28/2000
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/28/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/28/2000
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/28/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/28/2000
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/28/2000
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/28/2000
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 06/28/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 06/28/2000
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 06/28/2000
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/28/2000
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/28/2000
Sen. Edwards, John [D-NC] 06/28/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/28/2000
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/28/2000
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/29/2000
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/29/2000
Sen. Fitzgerald, Peter [R-IL] 07/10/2000
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/11/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/11/2000
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/12/2000
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/12/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/12/2000
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/12/2000
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/12/2000
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 07/13/2000
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/14/2000
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/14/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/17/2000
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/17/2000
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/26/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/26/2000
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/26/2000
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 07/26/2000
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/26/2000
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 07/26/2000
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/26/2000
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/27/2000
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/27/2000
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/27/2000
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/27/2000
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/08/2000
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/13/2000
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/20/2000