Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 01/21/1999
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1999
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/21/1999
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/21/1999
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 01/22/1999
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 01/22/1999
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 01/22/1999
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 01/22/1999
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/22/1999
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/22/1999
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/25/1999
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/28/1999
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/06/1999
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/08/1999
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/08/1999
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/23/1999
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/23/1999
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/24/1999
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/25/1999
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/02/1999
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/02/1999
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/02/1999
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/03/1999