There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Native American Business Development, Trade Promotion, and Tourism Act of 2000

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Native American Business Development, Trade Promotion, and Tourism Act of 2000

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for business development and trade promotion for Native Americans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/07/2000Became Public Law No: 106-464. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2000Signed by President.
10/30/2000Presented to President.
10/23/2000Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H10508-10511)
06/28/2000Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6034-6035; text: CR S6034-6035)
06/26/2000Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell without amendment. Without written report.
06/13/2000Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/07/2000Became Public Law No: 106-464. (TXT | PDF)
11/07/2000Signed by President.
10/30/2000SenatePresented to President.
10/23/2000-2:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/23/2000-2:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10508-10511)
10/23/2000-2:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2719.
10/23/2000-2:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10509-10511)
10/23/2000-2:51pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/18/2000HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
06/29/2000HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
06/29/2000-9:54amHouseReceived in the House.
06/29/2000SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/28/2000SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6034-6035; text: CR S6034-6035)
06/26/2000SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 630.
06/26/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Campbell without amendment. Without written report.
06/22/2000SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/13/2000SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/13/2000
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/13/2000
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/22/2000

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs06/13/2000 Referred to
06/22/2000 Markup by
06/26/2000 Reported by
House Resources06/29/2000 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/13/2000)

Native American Business Development, Trade Promotion, and Tourism Act of 2000 - Establishes the Office of Native American Business Development within the Department of Commerce, to be headed by a Director of Native American Business Development.

Provides for: (1) financial and technical assistance and administrative services for business development and legal and regulatory compliance to Indian tribes, organizations, and businesses (eligible entities); and (2) other assistance to enhance the economies of Indian tribes.

Bars assistance for activities related to gaming activities on Indian lands.

Requires the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Director, to carry out a Native American export and trade promotion program.

Provides for technical assistance and administrative services to eligible entities for: (1) identifying and entering appropriate markets for Indian goods and services; (2) complying with foreign or domestic laws and practices with respect to financial institutions with respect to exports and imports of such goods and services; and (3) entering into financial arrangements to provide for such exporting and importing.

Requires the Secretary, acting through the Director, to conduct a Native American tourism program to facilitate tourism demonstration projects by Indian tribes on a tribal, intertribal, or regional basis. Authorizes grants to, or other arrangements with, Indian tribes and organizations or other tribal entities to carry out such program.

Requires a demonstration project to be conducted for: (1) Indians of the Four Corners area in a specified area between Arizona, Utah, Colorado, and New Mexico; (2) Indians of the area known as the Great Northwest; (3) the Oklahoma Indians in Oklahoma; (4) Indians of the Great Plains area; and (5) Alaska Natives in Alaska. Provides for financial and technical assistance and administrative services for feasibility studies, market analyses, participation in tourism and trade missions, and related activities to participants selected to carry out tourism development projects.

Authorizes appropriations.