Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/15/2000
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/15/2000
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/11/2000
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 07/19/2000
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/19/2000
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/19/2000
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/20/2000
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/21/2000
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/24/2000
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/26/2000
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/27/2000
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/06/2000
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 09/07/2000
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/11/2000
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 09/14/2000
Sen. Chafee, Lincoln [R-RI] 09/19/2000
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/27/2000